CT HB06482 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - File Number 718
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - File Number 718
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish the Connecticut Trauma Committee as a standing committee that provides advice and comment to the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board regarding the most common trauma types and the affected patient population.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Trauma Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | File Number 718 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 405 |
2017-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6233 |
2017-04-13 | House | File Number 581 |
2017-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 383 |
2017-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-23 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2017-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |