CT HB06467 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow staff of Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated to approve financial aid transactions in amounts up to three hundred thousand dollars in order to expedite the financial aid process for smaller transactions and allow the board of directors to focus on larger, more material transactions.
Title
An Act Concerning Applications For Financial Aid From Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 404 PASS (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Act 13-115 |
2013-05-30 | House | In Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 600 |
2013-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | No New File by Committee on Commerce |
2013-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | File Number 297 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 207 |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |