CT HB06465 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - File Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - File Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical changes to the Connecticut Housing Finance Authority Act.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Housing Finance Authority Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | File Number 148 | |
2011-03-22 | House Calendar Number 101 | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |