CT HB06429 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To assist municipalities with the costs associated with tree removal and suppression programs resulting from gypsy moth and emerald ash borer infestations.
Title
An Act Concerning A Grant-in-aid Program For Municipalities Combating Gypsy Moth And Emerald Ash Borer Infestations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-14 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 612 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 366 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-03-11 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |