CT HB06425 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide aid in dying to terminally ill patients.
Title
An Act Concerning Aid In Dying For Terminally Ill Patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | House | File Number 93 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 100 |
2021-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |