CT HB06410 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that charter commissions, charter revision commissions and home rule ordinance revision commissions may only consider changes to charters and home rule ordinances recommended by the appointing authority or by petition.
Title
An Act Concerning The Revision Of Municipal Charters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 524 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 194 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 194 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-202 | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-31 | File Number 862 | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Calendar Number 574 | |
2011-05-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-26 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-26 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6553 | |
2011-03-28 | File Number 246 | |
2011-03-28 | House Calendar Number 157 | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-28 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |