CT HB06374 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-26-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) protect students who report being a victim or witness of sexual assault, stalking or violence from disciplinary action by an institution of higher education, and (2) establish a Council on Sexual Misconduct Climate Survey to approve sexual misconduct climate surveys for use by institutions of higher education in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Sexual Misconduct On College Campuses.

Sponsors

House Higher Education and Employment Advancement CommitteeRep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. Mary Welander [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]
Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Devin Carney [R]Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Stephen Meskers [D]
Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Laura Devlin [R]Sen. James Maroney [D]Rep. Maria Horn [D]
Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. Robin Green [R]Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]Rep. David Michel [D]
Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]Rep. Jennifer Leeper [D]Rep. Kate Farrar [D]
Sen. Rick Lopes [D]Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]
Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]Rep. William Petit [R]Rep. Kathy Kennedy [R]Rep. Michael Digiovancarlo [D]
Rep. Aimee Berger-Girvalo [D]Rep. Vincent Candelora [R]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]Rep. Amy Morrin Bello [D]
Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R]Rep. Ben Mcgorty [R]Rep. Carol Hall [R]
Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Brandon McGee [D]Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]Rep. Joseph Zullo [R]
Rep. Robin Comey [D]Rep. Irene Haines [R]Sen. Will Haskell [D]Rep. Christine Palm [D]
Rep. Jason Doucette [D]Sen. Kevin Witkos [R]Sen. Jorge Cabrera [D]Rep. Susan Johnson [D]
Sen. Derek Slap [D]Rep. John-Michael Parker [D]Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D]Rep. David Arconti [D]
Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]Rep. Tom Delnicki [R]Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D]
Rep. Brian Smith [D]Rep. Eleni Kavros DeGraw [D]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Kara Rochelle [D]
Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D]Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]
Rep. Anthony Nolan [D]Sen. Saud Anwar [D]Sen. Catherine Osten [D]Rep. Jill Barry [D]
Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Tammy Exum [D]Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Quentin Phipps [D]
Rep. Corey Paris [D]Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R]Rep. Stephanie Thomas [D]Rep. Tammy Nuccio [R]
Rep. Michelle Cook [D]Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R]Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R]Rep. Donna Veach [R]
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Sen. Tony Hwang [R]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]
Sen. Marilyn Moore [D]Sen. Eric Berthel [R]Sen. Robert Sampson [R]Sen. Paul Cicarella [R]
Sen. John Kissel [R]Sen. Craig Miner [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 355 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 189 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-06-18HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-18HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-16HousePublic Act 21-81
2021-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2021-06-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-27HouseFile Number 748
2021-05-27HouseSenate Calendar Number 512
2021-05-27HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-25HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8158
2021-04-06HouseFile Number 260
2021-04-06HouseHouse Calendar Number 214
2021-04-06HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-04-06HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
2021-03-19HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-18HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-02-26HousePublic Hearing 03/02
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06374&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06374-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06374-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00081-R00HB-06374-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08158-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09925-R00-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06374-R000260-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06374-R000260-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06374-R00LCO08158-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06374-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06374-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06374-R010748-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06374-R010748-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06374-R00LCO09925-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/SUM/PDF/2021SUM00081-R02HB-06374-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/H/PDF/2021HB-06374-R00HED-CV52-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00189-R00HB06374-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00355-R00HB06374-SV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback