CT HB06374 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Coordinated Long-term Disaster Relief And Recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 581 PASS (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 303 (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 303 (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 13-275 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 676 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2013-05-30 | House | House Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-01 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-08 | House | File Number 402 |
2013-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 270 |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |