CT HB06364 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To include the Office of Higher Education in the quarterly financial reporting process for the constituent units by adding it to the list of recipients of the report on actual expenditures submitted by each constituent unit.
Title
An Act Concerning The Receipt Of Quarterly Reports By The Office Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 443 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-137 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 341 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | House Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | File Number 27 |
2013-03-05 | House | House Calendar Number 54 |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 5:00 PM |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |