CT HB06356 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To adopt the Uniform Commercial Real Estate Receivership Act.
Title
An Act Adopting The Uniform Commercial Real Estate Receivership Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 354 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 58 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 58 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | House | Public Act 21-80 |
2021-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 386 |
2021-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | File Number 469 |
2021-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 337 |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |