CT HB06349 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require applicants for certificates of occupancy for new residential and commercial buildings to provide the building official with information concerning certain insurance policies.
Title
An Act Requiring The Provision Of Information Concerning Certain Insurance Policies Prior To The Issuance Of A Certificate Of Occupancy.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | No Action |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 610 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 364 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |