CT HB06348 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the placement of memorials to veterans in military facilities and on military property owned or controlled by the state and to clarify the statutory provisions pertaining to military service performed by members of the armed forces of the state, including those controlling pay and allowances, death, disability and injury benefits, and special benefits provided to state employees who perform ordered military duty.
Title
An Act Concerning State Military Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 75 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 75 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-17 | House | Public Act 13-25 |
2013-05-14 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-14 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-14 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-03 | House | File Number 705 |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 509 |
2013-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-01 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5039 |
2013-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5313 |
2013-04-02 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2013-03-05 | House | File Number 26 |
2013-03-05 | House | House Calendar Number 52 |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 5:00 PM |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |