CT HB06340 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To reflect changes in federal law and clarify the notice and filing requirements for closed-end companies, the securities offerings of which the United States Congress preempted the states from reviewing or registering.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Uniform Securities Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 415 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 107 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 107 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Act 13-106 |
2013-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-09 | House | File Number 785 |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Calendar Number 558 |
2013-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6426 |
2013-03-27 | House | File Number 212 |
2013-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 155 |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |