CT HB06323 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - File Number 65
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - File Number 65
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Banking Commissioner to update a report on the establishment of a state-owned bank to address new developments concerning state-owned banks and bankers' banks.
Title
An Act Requiring The Banking Commissioner To Update A Report On The Establishment Of A State-owned Bank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | File Number 65 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 84 |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |
2021-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |