CT HB06323 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - File Number 620
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - File Number 620
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make conforming and technical changes to the general statutes pursuant to the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), to authorize the Insurance Department to enforce provisions of the PPACA and to establish a Connecticut Health Partnership exchange pursuant to the PPACA.
Title
An Act Making Conforming Changes To The Insurance Statutes Pursuant To The Federal Patient Protection And Affordable Care Act, And Establishing A State Health Partnership Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | File Number 620 | |
2011-04-26 | House Calendar Number 367 | |
2011-04-26 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-04-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-03-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |