CT HB06313 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a tax for single-use carry out plastic and paper bags, use funds from such tax for environmental purposes and encourage consumers to use reusable bags.
Title
An Act Establishing A Tax On Single-use Plastic And Paper Bags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-03-13 | House | File Number 55 |
2017-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 71 |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-02-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |