CT HB06308 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Became Law, Not Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Became Law, Not Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow nonstate public employers, municipal-related employers, small employers and nonprofit employers to join the state employee health plan.
Title
An Act Concerning Healthcare Reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 396 PASS Order of the Day (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 395 ADOPT SENATE AMD L LCO 8501 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 394 ADOPT SENATE AMD K LCO 8462 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 393 ADOPT SENATE AMD J LCO 8495 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 392 ADOPT SENATE AMD I LCO 8470 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 391 ADOPT SENATE AMD H LCO 8486 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 ADOPT SENATE AMD G LCO 8453 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 ADOPT SENATE AMD F LCO 8484 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 388 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 8452 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 387 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 8457 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 386 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8493 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 385 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8460 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 384 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8469 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 210 AS AMENDED (Y: 86 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 209 LCO # 7743 (Y: 50 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2011-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 208 LCO # 7611 (Y: 46 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 395 ADOPT SENATE AMD L LCO 8501 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 394 ADOPT SENATE AMD K LCO 8462 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 393 ADOPT SENATE AMD J LCO 8495 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 392 ADOPT SENATE AMD I LCO 8470 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 391 ADOPT SENATE AMD H LCO 8486 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 ADOPT SENATE AMD G LCO 8453 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 ADOPT SENATE AMD F LCO 8484 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 388 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 8452 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 387 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 8457 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 386 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8493 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 385 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8460 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 384 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8469 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 210 AS AMENDED (Y: 86 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 209 LCO # 7743 (Y: 50 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2011-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 208 LCO # 7611 (Y: 46 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Became Law, Not Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-14 | Public Act 11-58 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,D | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule L 8501 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule K 8462 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule J 8495 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule I 8470 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 8486 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 8453 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 8484 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8452 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8457 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8493 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8460 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8469 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,D | |
2011-05-31 | File Number 868 | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Calendar Number 592 | |
2011-05-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-27 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,D | |
2011-05-27 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 7764 | |
2011-05-27 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 7743 | |
2011-05-27 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7611 | |
2011-05-27 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7576 | |
2011-05-25 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-25 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-05-25 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-24 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-05-19 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-19 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-17 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-11 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-09 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 483 | |
2011-04-07 | House Calendar Number 282 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-03-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |