CT HB06304 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the study of the viability of new district heating networks in the state and to require that such a study be included as a component of the Comprehensive Energy Strategy.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Combined Heat And Power And District Heating Systems And Requiring A Study Of The Viability Of New District Heating Networks In The State As Part Of The Comprehensive Energy Strategy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 451 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 452 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 353 AS AMENDED (Y: 100 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 452 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 353 AS AMENDED (Y: 100 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-23 | House | Public Act 17-227 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 605 |
2017-06-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-06 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8706 |
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-06 | House | File Number 450 |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 311 |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2017-03-16 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |