CT HB06298 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - File Number 450
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - File Number 450
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that a nursing home facility or residential care home on which a civil penalty has been imposed pay such penalty from moneys set aside for administrative costs and expenses of the nursing home facility or residential care home.
Title
An Act Concerning Payment Of Civil Penalties By Nursing Homes And Residential Care Homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | File Number 450 |
2023-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 287 |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2023-03-14 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2023-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |