CT HB06283 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To protect nonusers from exposure to electronic nicotine delivery systems and vapor products.
Title
An Act Regulating Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems And Vapor Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 444 PASS AS AMENDED BY HOUSE A (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 132 AS AMENDED (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 132 AS AMENDED (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | House | Public Act 15-206 |
2015-06-03 | House | In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-18 | House | File Number 847 |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 550 |
2015-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-14 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6666 |
2015-04-16 | House | File Number 673 |
2015-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 435 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |