CT HB06243 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make a technical change to section 20-206g of the general statutes by deleting the references to "Thai yoga".
Title
An Act Concerning The Practice Of Thai Yoga.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Auden Grogins [D] | Rep. Linda Orange [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 293 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 85 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 85 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-20 | House | Public Act 13-37 |
2013-05-15 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-03 | House | File Number 704 |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 511 |
2013-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6003 |
2013-04-18 | House | File Number 571 |
2013-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 357 |
2013-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2013-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |