CT HB06161 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the use of helmets by motorcycle operators and passengers under twenty-one years of age.
Title
An Act Requiring The Use Of Helmets By Motorcycle Operators And Passengers Under Twenty-one Years Of Age.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Rep. Michelle Cook [D] | Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] |
Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 110 (Y: 113 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 513 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 399 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 288 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |