CT HB06157 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a timber harvesting revolving account to encourage the harvesting of timber from certain woodlands in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning State Forestry Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 523 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 174 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 174 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-192 | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed | |
2011-05-27 | Senate Calendar Number 567 | |
2011-05-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-25 | House Passed | |
2011-04-18 | File Number 555 | |
2011-04-18 | House Calendar Number 333 | |
2011-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-04-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-09 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-01-27 | Public Hearing 01/31 | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |