CT HB06156 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To create portability for the food service permit held by farmers and enable such farmers to readily sell their goods at multiple farmers' markets.
Title
An Act Concerning Farmers' Markets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 525 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 AS AMENDED (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 AS AMENDED (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-191 | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-31 | File Number 859 | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Calendar Number 578 | |
2011-05-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-26 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-26 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7019 | |
2011-04-20 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |
2011-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-12 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-21 | File Number 97 | |
2011-03-21 | House Calendar Number 74 | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-09 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-01-27 | Public Hearing 01/31 | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |