CT HB06120 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Public Hearing 03/04
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Public Hearing 03/04
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Connecticut Center for Worker Ownership.
Title
An Act Establishing A Connecticut Center For Worker Ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-18 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2021-02-04 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2021-02-04 | House | Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |