CT HB06104 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - File Number 68
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - File Number 68
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) make certain modifications to the administration of the regional planning incentive account and related programs, and (2) revise the bylaws requirements for officers and conduct of regional councils of governments.
Title
An Act Concerning Regional Planning And Councils Of Governments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | File Number 68 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Calendar Number 87 |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-01-29 | House | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |