CT HB06096 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 663
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To limit when health insurers may change lists of covered outpatient prescription drugs during a policy term.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Limiting Changes To Prescription Drug Formularies And Lists Of Covered Drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED (Y: 121 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 663
2019-06-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-01SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-01HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10394
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 396
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 249
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-03-07HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-07HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback