CT HB06093 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Insurance Commissioner to study the availability of health insurance coverage to individuals in this state who are unable to establish legal presence in the United States or present a valid Social Security number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Study Of The Availability Of Health Insurance Coverage To Immigrants In This State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-03-07HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-07HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback