CT HB05999 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement recommendations of the Council on Environmental Quality for properly enforcing pesticide restrictions.
Title
An Act Concerning Pesticide Regulation In The State.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] |
Rep. John Hampton [D] | Sen. Marilyn Moore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-15 | House | File Number 651 |
2019-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 396 |
2019-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-03-11 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |