CT HB05956 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Veterans' Affairs to maintain an Internet web site that provides information concerning services, benefits and programs available to veterans or their families.
Title
An Act Concerning The Internet Web Site Of The Department Of Veterans' Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 93 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-03 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-05-02 | Public Act 11-3 | |
2011-04-27 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Calendar Number 333 | |
2011-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-13 | House Passed | |
2011-03-30 | File Number 285 | |
2011-03-30 | House Calendar Number 182 | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-03-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-28 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |