CT HB05907 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the posting of diesel fuel cetane numbers on certain fuel pumps.
Title
An Act Requiring The Display Of Diesel Fuel Cetane Numbers On Fuel Pumps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 602 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 48 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 48 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | House | Public Act 13-270 |
2013-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 423 |
2013-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Passed |
2013-03-26 | House | File Number 168 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 131 |
2013-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2013-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |