CT HB05872 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Public Hearing 03/19
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Public Hearing 03/19
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish automatic application for voter registration at certain state agencies that currently make available voter registration information, and (2) create a presumption that any removal from a party enrollment list through such automatic application for voter registration was unintentional.
Title
An Act Expanding Automatic Application For Voter Registration To Certain State Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-10 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |