CT HB05857 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - House Recommitted to Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - House Recommitted to Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase recycling of bottled and canned beverages at retail food establishments, increase the overall waste diversion in the state and decrease the cost of waste management for towns.
Title
An Act Requiring Certain Retail Food Establishments To Have Recycling Bins On The Premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | House | House Recommitted to Environment |
2017-03-13 | House | File Number 52 |
2017-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 68 |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-01-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |