CT HB05832 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide one-time emergency expense grants to students' who experience unexpected financial hardships that impede such students ability to complete their degree.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Emergency Expense Grant Programs At Public Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 336
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 214
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-01-30HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-24HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback