CT HB05815 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - File Number 749
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - File Number 749
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require alterations to photos or illustrations in political advertising to be clearly highlighted in the disclaimer.
Title
An Act Concerning Political Advertising.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | File Number 749 |
2019-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 447 |
2019-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |