CT HB05780 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To legalize industrial hemp.
Title
An Act Legalizing Industrial Hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 467 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 317 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 317 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-16 | House | Public Act 15-202 |
2015-06-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-06-01 | House | Senate Calendar Number 643 |
2015-06-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-01 | House | House Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | File Number 308 |
2015-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 190 |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2015-03-09 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |