CT HB05727 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To change the time for a hospital to notify a parent when a child is admitted to the hospital for diagnosis or treatment of a mental disorder from within five days of the child's admission to not later than one day after the child's admission.
Title
An Act Concerning The Time For Parental Notification When A Child Is Admitted To A Hospital For Diagnosis Or Treatment Of A Mental Disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 474 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-130 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 591 |
2013-05-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | File Number 356 |
2013-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 235 |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2013-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |