CT HB05671 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To expand medical assistance for adults over the age of twenty-one with autism spectrum disorder.
Title
An Act Expanding Medical Assistance For Adults With Autism Spectrum Disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-18 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | House | Change of Reference Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2021-02-05 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health |
2021-02-04 | House | Change of Reference Public Health |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |