CT HB05651 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-20 - Public Hearing 02/24
Pending: Joint Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-20 - Public Hearing 02/24
Pending: Joint Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the task force on reverse mortgages.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Task Force On Reverse Mortgages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |
2015-02-17 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |