CT HB05618 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that Middlesex Community College is able to fulfill its mission.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonds Of The State For Capital Projects At Middlesex Community College.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Rep. Thomas Vicino [D] |
Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. Dante Bartolomeo [D] | Rep. Philip Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-02-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |