CT HB05610 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that absentee and overseas ballots accurately reflect the candidates for nomination or election.
Title
An Act Concerning Replacement Of A Candidate On A Ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |