CT HB05608 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To enable the restoration of farmlands that host certain solar projects to production agricultural condition.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Solar Photovoltaic Facilities Located On Prime Farmland, Farmland Of State-wide Importance Or Core Forest Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 483 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-21 | House | Public Act 23-163 |
2023-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 601 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2023-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7160 |
2023-03-21 | House | File Number 125 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 97 |
2023-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2023-02-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |