CT HB05602 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt institutions of higher education that arrange for professors to teach free for-credit courses to inmates from state contracting requirements.
Title
An Act Exempting Institutions Of Higher Education That Offer Free Courses To Inmates From State Contracting Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 353 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 65 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 65 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-28 | House | Public Act 13-68 |
2013-05-22 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 466 |
2013-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-04-11 | House | File Number 457 |
2013-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 293 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-03-18 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |