CT HB05600 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - File Number 878
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Revenue Services to study the potential tax implications of allowing companies to organize as benefit limited liability companies under state law and submit a report to the legislative finance and commerce committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Study Of The Tax Implications Of Allowing Benefit Limited Liability Companies Under State Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseFile Number 878
2019-05-15HouseHouse Calendar Number 586
2019-05-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-09HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/14/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-30HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-04-15HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-06HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback