CT HB05598 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To validate the disposition of certain claims by the Claims Commissioner.
Title
An Act Validating The Disposition Of Certain Claims By The Claims Commissioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 82 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 479 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-20 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-04 | House | File Number 422 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 287 |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |