CT HB05596 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Revenue Services to conduct a study concerning certain state tax laws.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Concerning Certain State Tax Laws And Authorizing Certain Municipalities To Delay Revaluations Of Real Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 423 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 286 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 427 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 286 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 427 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | House | Special Act 16-14 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B |
2016-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 608 |
2016-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-05-04 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2016-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6228 |
2016-05-04 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 5569 |
2016-04-12 | House | File Number 585 |
2016-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 359 |
2016-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |