CT HB05591 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To diversify municipal revenue options and phase out the motor vehicle property tax.
Title
An Act Concerning The Machinery Rental Surcharge Rate, Certain Municipal Filing Fees And The Property Tax Exemption For Certain Paint Mixing Machinery And Equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 322 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 206 AS AMENDED (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 206 AS AMENDED (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Public Act 18-136 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 505 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-04 | Senate | File Number 686 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4921 |
2018-04-19 | House | File Number 602 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 404 |
2018-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 04/02 |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |