CT HB05584 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 600
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 600
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a tax credit for employers that provide paid family and medical leave benefits and to authorize the Treasurer to establish a family and medical leave benefits account program.
Title
An Act Establishing A Tax Credit For Employers That Provide Paid Family And Medical Leave Benefits And Concerning Family And Medical Leave Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | File Number 600 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 402 |
2018-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 04/02 |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |