CT HB05583 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To support the growth of small businesses in Connecticut by allowing investments in additional types of businesses to qualify for an angel investor tax credit.
Title
An Act Expanding Investment Eligibility Under The Angel Investor Tax Credit Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 49 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 49 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-16 | House | Public Act 17-110 |
2017-06-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Senate Calendar Number 259 |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | House Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | File Number 347 |
2017-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 253 |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2017-02-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |