CT HB05548 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-23-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-23-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement recommendations of the legislative task force on domestic violence.
Title
An Act Concerning Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 370 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 153 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 153 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-23 | Public Act 12-114 | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-02 | File Number 619 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Calendar Number 451 | |
2012-05-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-30 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-30 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4270 | |
2012-04-24 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-24 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-20 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-19 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-19 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-18 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2012-04-13 | File Number 415 | |
2012-04-13 | House Calendar Number 332 | |
2012-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-19 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |
2012-03-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |